Hoefs v. Sig Sauer Inc
Plaintiff: Cody J. Hoefs and Cody J Hoefs
Defendant: Sig Sauer Inc. and Sig Sauer Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv05173
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ronald J Clark on behalf of Defendant Sig Sauer Inc. (Clark, Ronald)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brittany A. Madderra on behalf of Defendant Sig Sauer Inc. (Madderra, Brittany)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ronald J Clark Brittany A. Madderra on behalf of Defendant Sig Sauer Inc. (Madderra, Brittany) Modified on 4/24/2020 (GMR).
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - Corporate Parent or Affiliate indicated by filer, but not added in CM/ECF. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sig Sauer Inc (Madderra, Brittany)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Sig Sauer Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/15/2020, (Madderra, Brittany)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE to Filer re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement: Ronald J. Clark and Brittany Madderra, you are not properly before this Court at this time. If it is your intent to continue as part of this case, a Notice of Appearance is required and should be promptly filed using your ECF login and password. Thank you. (SP)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sig Sauer Inc mailed on 2/26/2020 (Purtzer, Brett)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge J Richard Creatura added. (GMR)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Sig Sauer Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6174022), filed by Cody J. Hoefs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Purtzer, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoefs v. Sig Sauer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer Inc
Represented By: Brittany A. Madderra
Represented By: Ronald J Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody J. Hoefs
Represented By: Brett Andrews Purtzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody J Hoefs
Represented By: Brett Andrews Purtzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?