Landreth v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Thomas G Landreth
Defendant: Persons or Parties Unknown, Quinault Indian Tribe and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv05333
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ronald B Leighton
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C Kipnis on behalf of Defendant United States of America. (Kipnis, Brian)
May 28, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Un-Redact Information from Federal Bureau of Land Management or Bureau of Indian Affairs, filed by Plaintiff Thomas G Landreth. Noted by clerk for: 6/12/2020. (GMR)
May 26, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time for Notice of Joint Status and Disclosure Conference, filed by Plaintiff Thomas G Landreth. Noted by clerk for: 6/5/2020. (GMR)
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 OBJECTIONS to #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ( #16 Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer), filed by Plaintiff Thomas G Landreth. (GMR)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Quinault Indian Tribe answer due 6/15/2020; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 19, 2020 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint , filed by Defendant Quinault Indian Tribe. Noting Date 5/19/2020, (Allston, Karen)
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/Notice of Receipt of #10 MOTION to Annex Additional Exhibits to Complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Thomas G Landreth. (GMR)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, filed by Defendant Quinault Indian Tribe. Noting Date 5/18/2020, (Allston, Karen)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karen D Allston on behalf of Defendant Quinault Indian Tribe. (Allston, Karen) Modified on 5/18/2020 (GMR).
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Defendant Quinault Indian Tribe, to #10 MOTION to Annex Additional Exhibits to Complaint re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Allston, Karen)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karen D Allston on behalf of Defendant Quinault Indian Tribe. (Allston, Karen)
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Annex Additional Exhibits to #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Thomas G Landreth. Noted by Clerk for: 5/29/2020. (GMR)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed via Certified Mail upon defendant Quinault Indian Tribe on 4/29/2020; United States of America on 4/29/2020. (GMR)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Quinault Indian Tribe, United States of America. (NOTE: paper summons received via USPS, issued electronically) (GMR)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 7/23/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/9/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/16/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ronald B. Leighton for all further proceedings as this matter is related to 3:14-cv-06025-RBL. Judge Benjamin H. Settle no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE: Plaintiff Thomas G Landreth has registered to receive electronic service. The party WILL NOT be e-filing. (STP)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:14-cv-06025-RBL, by Plaintiff Thomas G Landreth. (GMR)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants Persons or Parties Unknown, Quinault Indian Tribe and United States of America, filed by Thomas G Landreth. (Summons(es) not issued as they were incomplete) (Receipt # TAC016113) (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Exhibits 1-9, #3 Exhibits 10-18, #4 Exhibits 19-27, #5 Exhibits 28-38, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons USA (incomplete- not issued), #8 Summons Quinault (incomplete- not issued))(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landreth v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Persons or Parties Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinault Indian Tribe
Represented By: Karen D Allston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G Landreth
Represented By: Thomas G Landreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?