Cortez v. Blackstone Labs LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory Cortez
Defendant: Blackstone Labs, LLC and Blackstone Labs LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05364
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Blackstone Labs LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/19/2020. (GMR)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carl J Marquardt on behalf of Defendant Blackstone Labs LLC. (Marquardt, Carl)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew D Schultz for Plaintiff Gregory Cortez, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Blackstone Labs LLC on 4/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew D. Schultz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Gregory Cortez (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6309138 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholas Ryan Barthel for Plaintiff Gregory Cortez, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicholas R. Barthel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Gregory Cortez (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6289218 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas) LOCAL COUNSEL maintains an office in California Seattle, WA 4/23/2020 (DS).
April 20, 2020 JSR due 7/20/2020. (JL)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/6/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/13/2020, Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Blackstone Labs LLC (GMR)
April 17, 2020 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (GMR)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Blackstone Labs, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6277051), filed by Gregory Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kazerounian, Abbas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Blackstone Labs LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Labs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Labs LLC
Represented By: Carl J Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Cortez
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Barthel
Represented By: Matthew D Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?