Donahoe v. Donahoe et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Douglas Donahoe
Defendant: Debbie Borchers, Trudi lnslee, Karl Hack, lvanka Trump, Jay Sekulow, Angela Colaiuta, Susan Marie Miljour, Steve Borchers, Jennifer Ridas, Malorie McDonald, Erin Ruperts, Ferris Beverly Donahoe, Mike Gregoire, Adriana Checknic, R. G., Planet Fitness, Kara Ostby, Shon Hopwood, Michelle Obama, CT Corporation System, Douglas Mah, Pastor Rick Warren, Scott Carino, Kimberly Guilfoyle, MacKenzie Bezos, Ronald Leighton, Leena Fawaz Moten, Daily Olympian Corporation, Doug Mah, Gerry Pickens, Office of Superintendent of Public Instruction, King 5 News Corporation, Q Manager at Planet Fitness, Terry Farmer, Ivanka Trump, All the Public Defenders in Washington, Andrina Checknic, Steve Wolfords, Supreme Court of Washington State, Brandon Connelly, Steve Jewell, County of Thurston Washington, All the Attorneys at Lee Smart PS LLC, Leena Fawazz Moten, All the Attorneys at the Justice Project, David Westphal, Gary Briggs, Olympia School District, Nicole Bege, Jennifer Rida, R.G., Rick Warren, Trudi Inslee and Carolyn Collins
Case Number: 3:2020cv05388
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: This case is closed and judgment has been entered. The pending #19 Motion is DENIED, by Senior Judge Donald W Molloy. (GMR)
May 20, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Michael K. Rhodes in Support of Emergency Motion to Prohibit Pro Se Contact with Non-Appearing Attorneys and Staff filed by Defendants Debbie Borchers, Steve Borchers, Ferris Beverly Donahoe re #19 MOTION Emergency to Prohibit Pro Se Contact with Non-Appearing Attorneys and Staff and Request for Relief from Notice Deadline (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rhodes, Michael)
May 20, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION Emergency to Prohibit Pro Se Contact with Non-Appearing Attorneys and Staff and Request for Relief from Notice Deadline, filed by Defendants Debbie Borchers, Steve Borchers, Ferris Beverly Donahoe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Rhodes, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Defendants against Kevin Douglas Donahoe. (GMR- cc: pltf)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Dismissing Complaint Against all Defendants with Prejudice re Motions (Dkts. #5 , #6 , #8 , #10 , #11 ), signed by Senior Judge Donald W Molloy. Excepting a Notice of Appeal, no further filings will be accepted in this case from Donahoe. The Court makes no finding whether he should be deemed a vexatious litigation. Defendant Karl Hack's counterclaims for sanctions and fees are Dismissed. (GMR- cc: pltf)
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Joinder to Thurston County's Motion to declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DECLARATION THAT PLAINTIFF IS A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT, filed by Defendant Karl Hack. Noting Date 6/12/2020, (Bannan, Carinne)
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF A DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN THE NINTH CIRCUIT signed by Sidney R. Thomas, Chief Judge US Courts for the Ninth Circuit; Judge Donald W. Molloy is designated to perform the duties of United States District Judge temporarily for the Western District of Washington. Paper copy sent to Plaintiff at Olympia address. (TC)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Donald W Molloy for all further proceedings. Judge Robert J. Bryan no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. *Paper copy sent to Plaintiff at Olympia address. (TC) *Modified on 5/11/2020 (TC).
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DECLARATION THAT PLAINTIFF IS A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT (Peters, Donald)
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Scott C. Cushing filed by Defendants Angela Colaiuta, County of Thurston Washington re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DECLARATION THAT PLAINTIFF IS A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT (Peters, Donald)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DECLARATION THAT PLAINTIFF IS A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT, filed by Defendants Angela Colaiuta, County of Thurston Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) Noting Date 6/12/2020, (Peters, Donald)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Party , filed by Defendants Debbie Borchers, Steve Borchers, Ferris Beverly Donahoe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Rhodes, Michael)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; filed by Defendant Jennifer Rida. (Hemphill, Michael)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Jennifer Rida. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Hemphill, Michael)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Carinne E. Bannan filed by Defendant Karl Hack re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(C) (Bannan, Carinne)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(C), filed by Defendant Karl Hack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Bannan, Carinne)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Ronald Leighton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Fogg, Christina)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael K Rhodes on behalf of Defendants Debbie Borchers, Steve Borchers, Ferris Beverly Donahoe. (Rhodes, Michael)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA - cc: plaintiff)
April 24, 2020 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (ERA)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Ronald Leighton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 5th Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Thurston County Superior Court Dkts. 1-12, #3 Dkts. 13-18, #4 Dkts. 19-25, #5 Dkts. 26-27, #6 Dkt. 28, #7 Dkts. 29-30, #8 Dkt. 31, #9 Dkts. 32-34, #10 Dkts. 35-42, #11 Dkts. 43-58, #12 Dkts. 59-72, #13 Dkts. 73-87, #14 Dkts. 88-102)(Fogg, Christina)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 20-2-00633-34; (), filed by Ronald Leighton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fogg, Christina) (No Fee Required) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2020: #2 Amended Complaint 5th Amended Version (Operative Complaint)) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donahoe v. Donahoe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Borchers
Represented By: Michael K Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudi lnslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Hack
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Downer
Represented By: Carinne E Jaeger
Represented By: Carinne Bannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lvanka Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Sekulow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Colaiuta
Represented By: Scott C. Cushing
Represented By: Jon J. Tunheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Marie Miljour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Borchers
Represented By: Michael K Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ridas
Represented By: Michael K Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malorie McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Ruperts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferris Beverly Donahoe
Represented By: Michael K Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Gregoire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Checknic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Ostby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shon Hopwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CT Corporation System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Mah
Represented By: Jonathan A Sprouffske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pastor Rick Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Carino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacKenzie Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Leighton
Represented By: Christina Fogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leena Fawaz Moten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daily Olympian Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Mah
Represented By: Jonathan A Sprouffske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Superintendent of Public Instruction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King 5 News Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q Manager at Planet Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivanka Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All the Public Defenders in Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrina Checknic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Wolfords
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Court of Washington State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Thurston Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All the Attorneys at Lee Smart PS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leena Fawazz Moten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All the Attorneys at the Justice Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Westphal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympia School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Bege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Rida
Represented By: Michael K Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudi Inslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Douglas Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?