Davis v. Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Lynn Davis
Defendant: Sargent Hull, Aaron Pollard, Sasha Bangs, Dr Michael Furst, Jason Butz, Department of Corrections, T Pleaines, Marci Newlon and Elizabeth Zeiger
Case Number: 3:2020cv05433
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Elizabeth Zeiger mailed on 5/21/2020 (Millikan, Jackson)
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Michael Furst mailed on 6/25/2020 (Spencer, Caitlyn)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Jones terminated as to Defendants Elizabeth Zeiger and Michael Furst. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jeremy B. Jones, filed by Defendant Elizabeth Zeiger. Noting Date 6/15/2020, (Hunter, Ramona)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald B. Leighton recused and no longer assigned to case. Entered as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramona Noel Hunter on behalf of Defendant Elizabeth Zeiger. (Hunter, Ramona)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Caitlyn Spencer on behalf of Defendant Michael Furst. (Spencer, Caitlyn)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip J. Vanderhoef on behalf of Defendant Michael Furst. (Vanderhoef, Philip)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeremy Jones on behalf of Defendants Sasha Bangs, Jason Butz, Department of Corrections, Michael Furst, Hull, Marci Newlon, T Pleines, Aaron Pollard, Elizabeth Zeiger. (Jones, Jeremy)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/10/2020, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DK)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DK)
May 8, 2020 Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) ALL DEFENDANTS Jerry Lynn Davis with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jerry Lynn Davis.(Millikan, Jackson) (Fee Pending) Modified on 5/8/2020 (GMR).
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Jerry Lynn Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Millikan, Jackson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sargent Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasha Bangs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Michael Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Butz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Pleaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci Newlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lynn Davis
Represented By: Jackson E Millikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?