Coffman v. Encephalon Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ben Coffman
Defendant: Encephalon Inc, Does 1 through 25 and Encephalon Inc doing business as https://drjoedispenza.com
Case Number: 3:2020cv05564
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Encephalon Inc (Bemis, Lori)
July 15, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Encephalon Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/22/2020. (GMR)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lori Marie Bemis on behalf of Defendant Encephalon Inc. (Bemis, Lori)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Encephalon Inc on 6/19/2020 (Higbee, Mathew)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/8/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/14/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (CDA)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Encephalon Inc (CDA)
June 15, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:20-cv-00911 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number and Judge. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:20-cv-05564 BHS. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (CDA)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES ; filed by Plaintiff Ben Coffman. (Higbee, Mathew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Does 1 through 25 inclusive, Encephalon, Inc. d/b/a https://drjoedispenza.com with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6396719) Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Ben Coffman(pty:pla), filed by Ben Coffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121), #4 Summons)(Higbee, Mathew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffman v. Encephalon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Coffman
Represented By: Mathew K Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encephalon Inc doing business as https://drjoedispenza.com
Represented By: Lori Marie Bemis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?