Carter et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Mark Carter and Lori Carter
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv05672
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Johnson & Johnson mailed on 7/24/2020 (Yackulic, Corrie)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Ethicon Inc mailed on 7/24/2020 (Yackulic, Corrie)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SP)
July 10, 2020 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SP)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Southern District of West Virginia, case number in other court 2:12-md-02327 ; filed by Plaintiffs Lori Carter, Mark Carter. (Yackulic, Corrie)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6452841) Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Lori Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Mark Carter(pty:pla), filed by Lori Carter, Mark Carter. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yackulic, Corrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Carter
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Carter
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?