Gold Creek Condominium-Phase I Association of Apartment Owners v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Gold Creek Condominium-Phase I Association of Apartment Owners
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10 and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05690
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Gold Creek Condominium-Phase I Association of Apartment Owners (Stein, Daniel)
July 20, 2020 JSR due 10/19/2020 j. (JL)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/5/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/13/2020, Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Gold Creek Condominium-Phase I Association of Apartment Owners must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/27/2020. (GMR)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (GMR)
July 20, 2020 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (GMR)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6469371), filed by Gold Creek Condominium-Phase I Association of Apartment Owners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons State Farm)(Stein, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold Creek Condominium-Phase I Association of Apartment Owners v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Creek Condominium-Phase I Association of Apartment Owners
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Represented By: Jerry H. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?