Whitfield v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brad Lamonte Whitfield
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv05696
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Becia, Franco)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to US Attorney Western Washington & OGC Social Security Administration on 7/21/2020, filed by Plaintiff Brad Lamonte Whitfield. (Talbot, Charles)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons)(TF)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Brad Lamonte Whitfield.(TF)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. The Clerk shall issue summonses. (TF)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (TF)
July 20, 2020 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ERA)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Brad Lamonte Whitfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Talbot, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitfield v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Franco Luciano Becia
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Lamonte Whitfield
Represented By: Charles W Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?