Strand v. Rocha et al
Plaintiff: Hamal Strand and Hamal Jacob Strand
Defendant: Amorea Rocha, Marilyn Paja, Matthew White, John Doe #4, John Doe #1, Geryl Gilbert, Dominique C Singleton, John Doe #3, Bernard Brown, John Doe #2, Timothy Drury and Jud Parker
Case Number: 3:2020cv05706
Filed: July 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause, by no later than September 25, 2020, why this matter should not be dismissed with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH) (cc: Defendant Matthew White via USPS on 9/17/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER from Plaintiff re #8 Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Meet and confer and certificate of service filed by Hamal Jacob Strand (Strand, Hamal)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE by Defendants Amorea Rocha, Matthew White, to #12 MOTION for Contempt. (LH)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of No final judgment filed by Plaintiff Hamal Jacob Strand re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Strand, Hamal)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Hamal Jacob Strand, to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. (Strand, Hamal)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, by Amorea Rocha, Matthew White. (LH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Amorea Rocha and Matthew White. (LH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Hamal Jacob Strand re #16 Minute Order, CORRECTION (Strand, Hamal)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER re #15 Certificate of Service: The Court advises the parties that there is no hearing set on Plaintiff's motion for contempt (Dkt. No. #12 ) the motion is merely noted for September 11, 2020 which means that is the date on which the motion is ripe for ruling. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LH)(CC to Defendant Matthew White via mail on 8/31/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Hamal Jacob Strand re #12 MOTION for Contempt Notice of hearing (Strand, Hamal)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 PRAECIPE to attach document Corrected signature pages re #12 MOTION for Contempt by Plaintiff Hamal Jacob Strand (Strand, Hamal)
August 25, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #12 MOTION for Contempt: Corrected docket text to reflect proper title of document. (LH)
August 25, 2020 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #12 Cross Motion was improperly signed by Hamal Strand. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please do not file a new Motion. Instead, please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (LH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 CROSS-MOTION for Contempt re #9 MOTION to Dismiss., filed by Plaintiff Hamal Jacob Strand. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of motion, #2 Declaration in support of motion) Noting Date 9/11/2020, (Strand, Hamal) Modified on 8/25/2020 to correct document title (LH).
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Amorea Rocha re #9 MOTION to Dismiss, #10 Waiver of Service. (LH)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Matthew White; mailed to defendant on unknown date. (PM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amorea Rocha; mailed to defendant on unknown date. (PM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Claim Splitting and Res Judicata with Prejudice by Defendants Amorea Rocha, Matthew White (not properly appeared). Noted by Clerk for 9/11/2020 (PM)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/28/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/14/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/21/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: Defendant Amorea Rocha has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (STP)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bernard Brown, Timothy Drury, Geryl Gilbert, Marilyn Paja, Jud Parker, Amorea Rocha, Matthew White (Attachments: #1 Summons Matthew White, #2 Summons Jud Parker, #3 Summons Geryl Gilbert, #4 Summons Marilyn Paja, #5 Summons Bernard Brown, #6 Summons Timothy Drury) (PM)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: Plaintiff Hamal Jacob Strand has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (STP)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Bernard Brown, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, Timothy Drury, Geryl Gilbert, Marilyn Paja, Jud Parker, Amorea Rocha, Matthew White with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Hamal Jacob Strand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (PM)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS on 7/31/2020
July 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Hamal Strand. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge David W Christel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Transmittal Email) (ERA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strand v. Rocha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amorea Rocha
Represented By: Amorea Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Paja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geryl Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique C Singleton
Represented By: Amorea Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jud Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamal Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamal Jacob Strand
Represented By: Hamal Jacob Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?