Irving v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Ieesha Martha Irving
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2020cv05734
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT BY COURT. (GMR- cc: pltf)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application is denied. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. (GMR- cc: pltf)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Noted for 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment) (ERA - cc: plaintiff)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER of Case Opening Deficiency: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Civil Cover Sheet required. ** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GMR- cc: pltf w/form)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis referred to Judge J Richard Creatura, filed by Ieesha Martha Irving. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)(GMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irving v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ieesha Martha Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?