Kanam v. Office of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Kurt Kanam
Defendant: City of Tumwater, Office of the Governor of the State of Washington, State of Washington and Office of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 3:2020cv05786
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER from Clerk to parties re receipt of case from District of District of Columbia and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA - cc: plaintiff)
August 5, 2020 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (ERA)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia, Case Number 1:20-cv-00340.
August 4, 2020 Case transferred to the USDC for the Western District of Washington, pursuant to the Court Order entered 7/15/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/15/20. (lccrc1) Modified on 7/15/2020 (lsj). [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 7/7/2020. (lsj) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Given that, with the dismissal of the federal defendant, the only remaining defendants in the case are located in Washington state, Plaintiff identifies no relevant event or omission that occurred in Washington, D.C., and the property that appears to be the subject of litigation is located in the Western District of Washington, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by July 7, 2020, why this Court should not transfer the case to that district based on improper venue and lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/23/20. (lccrc1) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the Office of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development's #4 Motion to Dismiss; granting Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Dismiss: In light of Plaintiff's #6 motion to voluntarily dismiss, the Court DISMISSES this case as to the Office of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/23/2020. (lccrc1) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 Summons (2) Issued as to CITY OF TUMWATER, STATE OF WASHINGTON. (ztd) Modified on 6/22/2020 (ztd). (mailed to plaintiff's address on record) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2020: #1 Notice and Consent) (ztd). [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF TUMWATER, STATE OF WASHINGTON filed by KURT KANAM.(ztd) ; ("Let this be filed" signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by KURT KANAM (ztd) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. Responses due by 6/10/2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/27/20. (lccrc1) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Hair, Christopher) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Hair, Christopher) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Plaintiff's Letter regarding Attachment A (ztd); ("Leave to file Granted" signed 2/26/2020 by Judge Christopher R. Cooper) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
February 20, 2020 SUMMONS (1) REISSUED as to OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF WASHINGTON (ztd) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
February 7, 2020 SUMMONS (5) Issued as to CITY OF TUMWATER, OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF WASHINGTON, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) Modified on 2/11/2020 (ztd). [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF TUMWATER, OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF WASHINGTON, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616102341) filed by KURT KANAM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) [Transferred from dcd on 8/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanam v. Office of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tumwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Governor of the State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Christopher Charles Hair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Kanam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?