Roberts et al v. Mason County Sheriffs Office et al
Plaintiff: Betty Roberts and Patrick Roberts
Defendant: Matt Gray, Casey Salisbury and Mason County Sheriffs Office
Case Number: 3:2020cv05823
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/10/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Mason County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
August 18, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GMR)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Matt Gray, Mason County Sheriffs Office, Casey Salisbury (McMahon, Patrick)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mason County Superior Court, case number 20-2-00364-23; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6535545), filed by Casey Salisbury, Matt Gray, Mason County Sheriffs Office. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(McMahon, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. Mason County Sheriffs Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Gray
Represented By: Patrick McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Salisbury
Represented By: Patrick McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: Patrick McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Roberts
Represented By: Bruce Justin Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Roberts
Represented By: Bruce Justin Finlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?