Barkhurst v. Sundstrom et al
Plaintiff: Ross P Barkhurst
Defendant: Washington Department of Fish and Wildlife and Cyndie Sundstrom
Case Number: 3:2020cv05825
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Cyndie Sundstrom, Washington Department of Fish and Wildlife.(Clay, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 JSR due 11/16/2020. (JL)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/2/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/9/2020, Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GMR)
August 18, 2020 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (GMR)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of State Filed Court Documents re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Cyndie Sundstrom, Washington Department of Fish and Wildlife. (Clay, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal, of Christopher M. Clay in Support of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendants Cyndie Sundstrom, Washington Department of Fish and Wildlife (Clay, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Cyndie Sundstrom, Washington Department of Fish and Wildlife. (Clay, Christopher)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 20-2-01742-34; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6535766), filed by Cyndie Sundstrom, Washington Department of Fish and Wildlife. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Clay, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barkhurst v. Sundstrom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Department of Fish and Wildlife
Represented By: Christopher M Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyndie Sundstrom
Represented By: Christopher M Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross P Barkhurst
Represented By: Joseph D. Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?