Sipe v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lisa Sipe
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv05827
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Dkt. #3 and Dkt. #4 signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Net Worth and Payment of EAJA Fees by Plaintiff Lisa Sipe (Halpern, Elie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint Attorney General, Office of General Counsel and US Attorney's Office by Plaintiff Lisa Sipe on 10/02/2020 (Halpern, Elie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Lisa Sipe for Service of Summons and Complaint (Halpern, Elie)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Katie Westall filed by Plaintiff Lisa Sipe re #9 MOTION TO STRIKE DOCUMENTS NO. 3 AND NO. 4 (Halpern, Elie)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO STRIKE DOCUMENTS NO. 3 AND NO. 4 , filed by Plaintiff Lisa Sipe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/9/2020, (Halpern, Elie)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (TW)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Lisa Sipe.(TW)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke.(TW)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Net Worth and Payment of EAJA Fees by Plaintiff Lisa Sipe (Halpern, Elie)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 STRICKEN per Minute Order Dkt. #14 . ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint Attorney General, Office of General Counsel and US Attorney's Office by Plaintiff Lisa Sipe on 09/18/2020 (Halpern, Elie) Modified on 10/8/2020 (TW).
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 STRICKEN per Minute Order Dkt. #14 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Lisa Sipe for Service of Summons and Complaint (Halpern, Elie) Modified on 10/8/2020 (TW).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (TW)
August 18, 2020 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (ERA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Lisa Sipe. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Halpern, Elie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sipe v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sipe
Represented By: Elie Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?