Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brookie Jo Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv05831
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Danielle R. Mroczek filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mroczek, Danielle)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/16/2020, (Mroczek, Danielle)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Danielle R Mroczek on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Mroczek, Danielle)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Office of the Regional Chief Counsel Region X, US Attorney for Western District of Washington, Attorney General of the US on 8/24/2020, filed by Plaintiff Brookie Jo Johnson. (Parham, Teal)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (TW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SP)
August 21, 2020 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (SP)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # AWAWDC-6541165) Attorney Teal M Parham added to party Brookie Jo Johnson(pty:pla), filed by Brookie Jo Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Parham, Teal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Danielle R Mroczek
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookie Jo Johnson
Represented By: Teal M Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?