Doan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Quan C Doan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv05841
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security, USAO, USAG, SSA. (AQ)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Quan C Doan.(AQ)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(AQ)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Quan C Doan.(Yanich, Eitan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (AQ)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency: - Signature is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate. Filer has until 9/8/2020 to correct. (SP)
August 25, 2020 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SP)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Quan C Doan. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Declaration of Eitan Yanich)(Yanich, Eitan) Modified on 8/25/2020 (SP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quan C Doan
Represented By: Eitan Kassel Yanich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?