Bearup v. Cintas Corporation
Plaintiff: Thomas Bearup and Thomas Bearup, Jr
Defendant: Cintas Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv05844
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #5 #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Keith David Griffin for Plaintiff Thomas Bearup, Jr, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/19/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/2/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kent Brandmeyer for plaintiff Thomas Bearup, Jr, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Trevor Carl Wong for plaintiff Thomas Bearup, Jr, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Yuk K Law for plaintiff Thomas Bearup, Jr, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 CORRECTED APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Keith Griffin by Plaintiff Thomas Bearup, Jr. re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice AWAWDC-6555959 (Diefenbach, Maggie) Modified on 8/26/2020 correct title of document and link to initial application (CDA).
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kent Brandmyer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Thomas Bearup, Jr (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6556069 (Diefenbach, Maggie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Yuk Law FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Thomas Bearup, Jr (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6556053 (Diefenbach, Maggie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Trevor Wong FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Thomas Bearup, Jr (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6556041 (Diefenbach, Maggie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Keith Griffin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Thomas Bearup, Jr (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6555959 (Diefenbach, Maggie)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cintas Corporation. (SP)
August 26, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SP)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Thomas Bearup (Diefenbach, Maggie)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Thomas Bearup. (Diefenbach, Maggie)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs Cintas Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6547434), filed by Thomas Bearup.(Diefenbach, Maggie) Modified on 8/26/2020 to change party filing is against (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bearup v. Cintas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bearup
Represented By: Maggie Diefenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bearup, Jr
Represented By: Maggie Diefenbach
Represented By: Trevor Carl Wong
Represented By: Kent Brandmeyer
Represented By: Yuk K Law
Represented By: Keith David Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?