Kooi v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Joslyn Ethel Kooi
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05864
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in Northern District of California as case 3:20-cv-06656 on 9/23/2020. (LH)
September 22, 2020 Case sent to the Northern District of California by electronic case transfer. (PM)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 MDL 2741 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -233). In re Roundup Products Liability Litigation; Northern District of Caifornia; assigned to Judge Vince Chharbria. (PM)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ERA)
August 28, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ERA)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Monsanto Company.(Campbell, Jennifer)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Monsanto Company (Campbell, Jennifer)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Monsanto Company (Campbell, Jennifer)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Monsanto Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Campbell, Jennifer)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 20-2-01837-34; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6556373), filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Campbell, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kooi v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joslyn Ethel Kooi
Represented By: Daniel Foster Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Jennifer Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?