Lough v. Washington State Department of Social and Health Services et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lough
Defendant: Byron Eagle, Washington State Department of Social and Health Services, Heather Sacha, Mark Hunt, Shawn Candella, Washington State Special Commitment Center, Brian Shirley and David Flynn
Case Number: 3:2020cv05894
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. To consent to a US Magistrate Judge, return the executed form by 11/23/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (SP- cc: plaintiff)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by First-Class Mail to the named defendants (8); signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. ( #10 Complaint, this Order, notice of lawsuit and waiver of service, and notice of option to consent mailed on 10/23/2020) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)(SP- cc: plaintiff)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Shawn Candella, Byron Eagle, David Flynn, Mark Hunt, Heather Sacha, Brian Shirley, Washington State Department of Social and Health Services, and Washington State Special Commitment Center with JURY DEMAND, filed by Robert Lough. (IFP Granted) (SP) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/22/2020) (SP).
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (SP- cc: plaintiff)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Check status of service waivers per #11 Order Directing Service, due by 11/30/2020. (SP)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #7 SIGNATURE PAGE re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis/Proposed Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Robert Lough. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter & Envelope)(GMR)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SIGNATURE PAGE re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis/Proposed Complaint. (Deficiency corrected) (GMR) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/20/2020) (GMR).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency: - Signature is missing from the Complaint. Please sign as appropriate. Filer has until 10/8/2020 to correct. (GMR- cc: plaintiff w/signature page)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SP)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRAECIPE to attach document (Corrected Page 18 with Complaint Face Sheet) re #2 Praecipe and #1 -1 Proposed Personal Restraint Petition, filed by Plaintiff Robert Lough. (duplicative of #2 Praecipe with the addition of Complaint Face Sheet attached to this Praecipe) (SP)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRAECIPE to attach document (Corrected Page 18) re #1 -1 Proposed Personal Restraint Petition, filed by Plaintiff Robert Lough. (SP)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Robert Lough. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Personal Restraint Petition)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lough v. Washington State Department of Social and Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Social and Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Sacha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Candella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Special Commitment Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?