Payne v. Department of Social and Health Services et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Payne
Defendant: Department of Social and Health Services, Special Commitment Center, Sjan Talbot, William Van Hook, Henry Richards and David Flynn
Case Number: 3:2020cv05950
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Judge filed by Defendants Department of Social and Health Services, David Flynn, Henry Richards, Special Commitment Center, Sjan Talbot, William Van Hook re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(Judge, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE, by Defendants Department of Social and Health Services, David Flynn, Henry Richards, Special Commitment Center, Sjan Talbot, William Van Hook, to #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Judge, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 JSR due re #4 by 1/4/2021. (JL)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE as directed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Case reassigned for all further proceedings to Judge Robert J. Bryan and referred to Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura as related to 3:19-cv-05574-RJB-JRC. (GMR- cc: pltf)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Payne. Noted by clerk for: 11/13/2020. (GMR)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant William Van Hook mailed on 10/2/2020 (Judge, Daniel)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sjan Talbot mailed on 10/2/2020 (Judge, Daniel)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Henry Richards mailed on 10/2/2020 (Judge, Daniel)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant David Flynn mailed on 10/2/2020 (Judge, Daniel)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/21/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) cc: Pltf via mail
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Department of Social and Health Services, David Flynn, Henry Richards, Special Commitment Center, Sjan Talbot, William Van Hook.(Judge, Daniel)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP- cc: plaintiff)
September 29, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 20-2-07217-1; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6620577), filed by Special Commitment Center, Department of Social and Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of State Filed Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Daniel J. Judge)(Judge, Daniel) Modified on 9/29/2020 (SP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Department of Social and Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Social and Health Services
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Represented By: Vanessa James
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Commitment Center
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Represented By: Vanessa James
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sjan Talbot
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Represented By: Vanessa James
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Van Hook
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Represented By: Vanessa James
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Richards
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Represented By: Vanessa James
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Flynn
Represented By: Daniel J Judge
Represented By: Vanessa James
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?