United States of America et al v. Nova Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ballard Marine Construction, LLC, United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Ballard Marine Construction, LLC, Ballard Marine Construction LLC and United States of America
Defendant: NOVA GROUP, INC., Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Surety, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Nova Group Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv05954
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Robert Berry on behalf of Defendants Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Berry, Matthew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER re #5 Notice of Appearance. Matthew R Berry signature improper. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KMC)
November 20, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Defendants Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, TO RESPONSE to #20 MOTION to Dismiss (Sokol, Jan)
November 19, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION re #22 MOTION to Stay Discovery, filed by Defendants Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Surety. Noting Date 12/4/2020, (Sokol, Jan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Angelia D. Wesch filed by Defendant Nova Group Inc re #22 MOTION to Stay (Wesch, Angelia)
November 18, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendant Nova Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Defendant Nova Group Inc.'s Motion to Stay) Noting Date 12/4/2020, (Wesch, Angelia)
November 18, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Scott Victor filed by Defendant Nova Group Inc re #20 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Wesch, Angelia)
November 18, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Nova Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Defendant Nova Group Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 12/11/2020, (Wesch, Angelia)
November 16, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Ballard Marine Construction LLC, United States of America, to #14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marconi, Robert)
November 13, 2020 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Ballard Marine Construction LLC (Marconi, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Federal Insurance Company, Nova Group Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND Attorney Robert S Marconi added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America, Ballard Marine Construction LLC.(Marconi, Robert)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 STIPULATED MOTION TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS: Plaintiffs are directed to file the Amended Complaint on or before November 13, 2020. The parties are also directed to file a status report on or before November 13, 2020 informing the Court regarding whether the Amended Complaint impacts the pending Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #14 ); signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (SP)
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION to Amend Pleadings, filed by Plaintiff Ballard Marine Construction LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/3/2020, (Marconi, Robert)
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Surety. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/20/2020, (Sokol, Jan)
October 28, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Federal Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Federal Insurance Company (Sokol, Jan) Modified on 10/29/2020 to remove duplicate text (KMC).
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group Inc. Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Surety for Liberty Mutual Surety. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Liberty Mutual Surety (Sokol, Jan) Modified on 10/29/2020 to remove duplicate text (KMC).
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Nova Group Inc.(Wesch, Angelia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Quanta Services Inc. for Nova Group Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Nova Group Inc (Wesch, Angelia)
October 15, 2020 Attorney Douglas Stuart Oles added for Nova Group Inc, per #4 Notice of Appearance. (KMC)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
October 15, 2020 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 11/27/2020. (KEB)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/5/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/19/2020, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/20/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jan D Sokol on behalf of Defendants Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Surety. (Sokol, Jan)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelia D Wesch on behalf of Defendant Nova Group Inc. (Wesch, Angelia)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Traylor Construction Group, Inc. for Ballard Marine Construction LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ballard Marine Construction LLC (Marconi, Robert)
September 30, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Ballard Marine Construction LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/7/2020. (KB)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Federal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Surety, and Nova Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Nova Group Inc, #2 Summons Liberty Mutual Insurance Company) (KB)
September 30, 2020 Judge David W. Christel added. (KB)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6623815) Attorney Robert S Marconi added to party Ballard Marine Construction, LLC (pty:pla), Attorney Robert S Marconi added to party United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Ballard Marine Construction, LLC (pty:pla), filed by United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Ballard Marine Construction, LLC, Ballard Marine Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Nova, #3 Summons Federal Insurance, #4 Summons Liberty)(Marconi, Robert) Modified on 9/30/2020 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Nova Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Robert Berry
Represented By: Jan D Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Surety
Represented By: Jan D Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Robert Berry
Represented By: Jan D Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Group Inc
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Oles
Represented By: Angelia D Wesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ballard Marine Construction, LLC
Represented By: Robert S Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, for the Use and Benefit of Ballard Marine Construction, LLC
Represented By: Robert S Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ballard Marine Construction LLC
Represented By: Brian M Guthrie
Represented By: Robert S Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert S Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?