Cavallaro v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Santo Anthony Cavallaro
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv05969
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 OSC re IFP deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 11/30/2020, (TW)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Santo Anthony Cavallaro. Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (TW)
October 1, 2020 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (ERA)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Santo Anthony Cavallaro. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons OGC, #4 Summons USAG, #5 Summons USAO)(Kerr, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavallaro v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santo Anthony Cavallaro
Represented By: Kevin Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?