Hester v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Joshua Hester
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 3:2020cv06202
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Passenger Railroad Insurance Limited (PRIL), Washington Terminal Company (WTC), The United States, American Premier Underwriters Inc, American Financial Group Inc, Burlington Northern Santa Fe LLC (BNSF LLC), Berkshire Hathaway no as Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Wackerbarth, Tim) Modified on 1/29/2021 (KMC).
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6), filed by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/19/2021, (Yates, Andrew)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/24/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/31/2021, Joint Status Report due by 4/7/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
December 16, 2020 Attorney Andrew Gordon Yates added for National Railroad Passenger Corporation, per #3 Notice of Appearance. (KMC)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tim D. Wackerbarth on behalf of Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Wackerbarth, Tim)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (SP)
December 14, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) National Railroad Passenger Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6801133), filed by Joshua Hester. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hoyal, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hester v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hester
Represented By: David Merritt Beninger
Represented By: J Andrew Hoyal, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?