West et al v. City of Montesano et al
Plaintiff: Amanda West, both individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Easton West, Patrick Errol West, Bertha West and Amanda West
Defendant: The City of Hoquiam, Washington, The City of Montesano, Washington, The City of Aberdeen, Washington, Dale Green, Brett Vance, Andy Snodgrass, David Peterson, City of Hoquiam, City of Montesano and City of Aberdeen
Case Number: 3:2021cv05077
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William J Dow on behalf of Defendants City of Montesano, Brett Vance. (Dow, William)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas B Nedderman on behalf of Defendants City of Montesano, Brett Vance. (Nedderman, Thomas)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/26/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/3/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John E Justice on behalf of Defendants City of Aberdeen, City of Hoquiam, Dale Green, David Peterson, Andy Snodgrass. (Justice, John)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) City of Aberdeen, City of Hoquiam, City of Montesano, Dale Green, David Peterson, Andy Snodgrass, Brett Vance. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (AMD)
January 29, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (AMD)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6907051) Attorney Tiffany Mae Cartwright added to party Amanda West, both individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Easton West(pty:pla), Attorney Tiffany Mae Cartwright added to party Patrick Errol West(pty:pla), Attorney Tiffany Mae Cartwright added to party Bertha West (pty:pla), filed by Bertha West, Patrick Errol West, Amanda West, both individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Easton West. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Cartwright, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West et al v. City of Montesano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Hoquiam, Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Montesano, Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Aberdeen, Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Green
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Vance
Represented By: William J Dow
Represented By: Thomas B Nedderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Snodgrass
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Peterson
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hoquiam
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Montesano
Represented By: William J Dow
Represented By: Thomas B Nedderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aberdeen
Represented By: John E Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda West, both individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Easton West
Represented By: Tiffany Mae Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Errol West
Represented By: Tiffany Mae Cartwright
Represented By: Timothy K. Ford
Represented By: Mika K Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha West
Represented By: Tiffany Mae Cartwright
Represented By: Timothy K. Ford
Represented By: Mika K Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda West
Represented By: Tiffany Mae Cartwright
Represented By: Timothy K. Ford
Represented By: Mika K Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?