Wave Linx LLC v. Allstream Business US LLC
Plaintiff: Wave Linx LLC
Defendant: Allstream Business US, LLC and Allstream Business US LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv05136
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (LH)
March 18, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, and per Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (LH)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC (Curfman, Andrew)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00118-JLR, by Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC. (Curfman, Andrew)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Wave Linx LLC (Mann, Philip)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 3/8/2021. (AMD)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew S Curfman for Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew S. Curfman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6967321 (Mann, Philip)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Judge Robert J. Bryan no longer assigned to case. Entered as directed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action emailed to the US Patent Office. (AMD)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Allstream Business US LLC. (AMD)
February 25, 2021 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (AMD)
February 25, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Wave Linx LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/4/2021. (AMD)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6963628) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Wave Linx LLC(pty:pla), filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #5 Summons)(Mann, Philip) Modified on 2/25/2021 (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wave Linx LLC v. Allstream Business US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wave Linx LLC
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Represented By: Andrew S Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstream Business US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstream Business US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?