Lewis v. CytoDyn Inc et al
Plaintiff: Angela Lewis
Defendant: Nader Z Pourhassan, Michael Mulholland and CytoDyn Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05190
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant CytoDyn Inc mailed on 4/13/2021 (Stephens, Kim)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Nader Z Pourhassan mailed on 4/13/2021 (Stephens, Kim)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Michael Mulholland mailed on 4/13/2021 (Stephens, Kim)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/14/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John T Jasnoch for plaintiff Angela Lewis, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John T. Jasnoch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Angela Lewis (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7003778 (Stephens, Kim)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 Amended Summons issued as to Defendant CytoDyn Inc. (AMD)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Angela Lewis (Stephens, Kim)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re attorney John T Jasnochp. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) CytoDyn Inc, Michael Mulholland, Nader Z Pourhassan. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(AMD)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Violations of the Federal Securities Law against defendant(s) CytoDyn Inc, Michael Mulholland, Nader Z Pourhassan with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7002665), filed by Angela Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cytodyn, #3 Summons Mulholland, #4 Summons Pourhassan)(Stephens, Kim)
March 17, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. CytoDyn Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nader Z Pourhassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CytoDyn Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Lewis
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: John T Jasnoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?