United States of America v. Wise et al
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Pierce County Assessor, Laurie Wise, Boeing Employees' Credit Union, Estate of Douglas Wise, City of Tacoma and Douglas Wise
Case Number: 3:2021cv05197
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Cassondra L. McCormick in Support of the Motion for Order Permitting Service by Other Means on Defendants Laurie Wise and Estate of Douglas Wise and Motion for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff United States of America re #15 MOTION for Order Permitting Service by Other Means on Defendants Laurie Wise and Estate of Douglas Wise, #14 MOTION for Extension of Time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McCormick, Cassondra)
May 13, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Order Permitting Service by Other Means on Defendants Laurie Wise and Estate of Douglas Wise, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/28/2021, (McCormick, Cassondra)
May 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/28/2021, (McCormick, Cassondra)
April 29, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Boeing Employees' Credit Union on 3/29/2021 (McCormick, Cassondra)
April 29, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant City of Tacoma on 3/29/2021 3/24/2021 (McCormick, Cassondra) Modified on 4/29/2021 to correct date of service.(AMD)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Pierce County Assessor on 3/24/2021 (McCormick, Cassondra)
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pierce County Assessor.(DeMarco, Kimberley)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/28/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/6/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING JOINT #7 MOTION TO DISMISS BOEING EMPLOYEES' CREDIT UNION with prejudice, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
April 8, 2021 Noting Date noted by Clerk for 4/7/2021, re #7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Boeing Employees' Credit Union. (AMD)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Boeing Employees' Credit Union, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCormick, Cassondra)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul O Goulding on behalf of Defendant City of Tacoma. (Goulding, Paul)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kimberley DeMarco on behalf of Defendant Pierce County Assessor. (DeMarco, Kimberley)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant Laurie Wise. (KMC)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Boeing Employees' Credit Union, City of Tacoma, Pierce County Assessor. (Attachments: #1 Summons - City of Tacoma, #2 Summons - Pierce County Assessor)(KMC)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(McCormick, Cassondra)
March 19, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (AMD)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Cassondra McCormick added to party United States(pty:pla), filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormick, Cassondra) (No Fee Required)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County Assessor
Represented By: Kimberley DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Employees' Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Douglas Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tacoma
Represented By: Paul O Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Cassondra McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Cassondra McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?