HOPE Center for Christian Unity et al v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Life Staff Ministries, H.O.P.E. Center for Christian Unity and HOPE Center for Christian Unity
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv05215
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STAYING CASE, granting #15 Stipulated Motion & resetting JSR due date to 7/9/2021. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
April 21, 2021 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION To Stay, filed by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Landreth, Justin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, by HOPE Center for Christian Unity, Life Staff Ministries.(Mam, Chelsey)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Counter Defendants HOPE Center for Christian Unity, Life Staff Ministries, Plaintiffs HOPE Center for Christian Unity, Life Staff Ministries (Mam, Chelsey)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company (Landreth, Justin)
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company (Landreth, Justin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #9 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim - Jury Demand Improperly Indicated. ***Action Required***See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KMC)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant Church Mutual Ins. Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand ., COUNTERCLAIM For Declaratory Relief against plaintiff HOPE Center for Christian Unity, Life Staff Ministries by Church Mutual Insurance Company.(Landreth, Justin)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by HOPE Center for Christian Unity, Life Staff Ministries (Mam, Chelsey)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/9/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/16/2021, Joint Status Report due by 6/23/2021. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
March 25, 2021 JSR due 6/23/2021. (JL)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Church Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Church Mutual Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company (Landreth, Justin)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 PRAECIPE to attach document Exhibit A Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company (Landreth, Justin)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Kitsap County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AMD)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Removal - Complaint Not Provided.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kitsap County Superior Court, case number 21-2-00203-18; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7011853) Attorney Justin Sean Landreth added to party Church Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Landreth, Justin) Modified superior court case number on 3/24/2021 (AMD).
March 24, 2021 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (AMD)
March 24, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, each Plaintiff and Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/31/2021. (AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOPE Center for Christian Unity et al v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Staff Ministries
Represented By: Chelsey Lyn Mam
Represented By: Kasey D Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.O.P.E. Center for Christian Unity
Represented By: Chelsey Lyn Mam
Represented By: Kasey D Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOPE Center for Christian Unity
Represented By: Chelsey Lyn Mam
Represented By: Kasey D Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin Sean Landreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?