Launch Pad Technologies Inc v. ADT LLC et al
Plaintiff: Launch Pad Technologies Inc doing business as Entrance Controls
Defendant: ADT, LLC
Cross Claimant: Deanna Moore
Counter Defendant: Launch Pad Technologies, Inc. dba Entrance Controls
Counter Claimant: ADT LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv05382
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: Lauren King
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgemen
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #38 Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to any party. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
July 6, 2022 Filing 38 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Cross Defendant ADT LLC, Defendant ADT LLC, Cross Claimant ADT LLC, Counter Claimant ADT LLC. Noting Date 7/6/2022, (Morisset, Catharine)
June 16, 2022 Filing 37 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Cross Defendant ADT LLC, Defendant ADT LLC, Cross Claimant ADT LLC, Counter Claimant ADT LLC. Noting Date 6/16/2022, (Morisset, Catharine)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Cross Defendant Deanna Moore's #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Lauren King.(MW) (cc: Moore via USPS)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #34 Third Stipulated MOTION to Continue Deadlines. The Court continues the following deadlines: Discovery completed by 6/3/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2022. All other pretrial deadlines shall remain the same. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
May 2, 2022 Filing 34 Third Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Continue Deadlines, filed by Defendant ADT LLC, Counter Claimant ADT LLC, Cross Claimant ADT LLC. Noting Date 5/2/2022, (Morisset, Catharine)
April 25, 2022 Noting Date Set/Reset re #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney: Noting Date 5/13/2022 (MW)
April 22, 2022 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Deanna Moore filed by Cross Defendants Deanna Moore, Deanna Moore, Cross Claimant Deanna Moore re #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Haddad, Joseph)
April 22, 2022 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Joseph J. Haddad filed by Cross Defendants Deanna Moore, Deanna Moore, Cross Claimant Deanna Moore re #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Haddad, Joseph)
April 22, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Cross Defendants Deanna Moore, Deanna Moore, Cross Claimant Deanna Moore. Noting Date 5/13/2022 5/6/2022, (Haddad, Joseph) Modified on 4/25/2022 (MW).
April 22, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Catharine M Morisset. Filed by Defendant ADT LLC, Counter Claimant ADT LLC, Cross Claimant ADT LLC. (Morisset, Catharine)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting #28 Second Stipulated MOTION to Continue Deadlines. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/17/2022. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
March 3, 2022 Filing 28 Second Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Continue Deadlines, filed by Defendant ADT LLC, Counter Claimant ADT LLC, Cross Claimant ADT LLC. Noting Date 3/3/2022, (Morisset, Catharine)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Amended Stipulated MOTION to Continue Deadlines. 5 Day Jury Trial is continued to 10/17/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Lauren King. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/4/2022, Discovery completed by 5/4/2022, Dispositive motions due by 6/2/2022, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 7/19/2022, Motions in Limine due by 9/12/2022, Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lauren King. Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/3/2022, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/3/2022. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
February 9, 2022 Filing 26 Amended Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Continue Deadlines, filed by Defendant ADT LLC, Counter Claimant ADT LLC, Cross Claimant ADT LLC. Noting Date 2/9/2022, (Morisset, Catharine)
February 2, 2022 Filing 25 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Continue Deadlines, filed by Defendant ADT LLC, Counter Claimant ADT LLC, Cross Claimant ADT LLC. Noting Date 2/2/2022, (Morisset, Catharine)
January 28, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Meghan Ashley-Renee McNabb on behalf of Defendant ADT LLC, Counter Claimant ADT LLC, Cross Claimant ADT LLC. (McNabb, Meghan)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
December 29, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Joseph J Haddad. Filed by Cross Defendant Deanna Moore. (Haddad, Joseph)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lauren King for all further proceedings. Judge Robert J. Bryan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan, re #19 Stipulated MOTION. (AMD)
November 16, 2021 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Launch Pad Technologies Inc. (Chenoweth, Brian)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES; Length of Trial: *FIVE DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 8/1/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Joinder of Parties due by 9/23/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/2/2022, Motions due by 3/14/2022, Discovery completed by 4/4/2022, Dispositive motions due by 5/3/2022, Motions in Limine due by 7/5/2022, Pretrial Order due by 7/15/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Trial briefs to be submitted by 7/22/2022, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 7/22/2022. s/Tyler Campbell, authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC)
August 24, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Morisset, Catharine)
July 15, 2021 Filing 16 Defendant/Counterclaimant ADT's ANSWER to #13 Answer to Crossclaim, Defendant Deanna Moore's Crossclaim by ADT LLC.(Morisset, Catharine)
June 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Joseph J Haddad for Cross Defendant Deanna Moore from June 15, 2021 - July 19, 2021. (Haddad, Joseph)
June 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sandra Gustitus on behalf of Plaintiff Launch Pad Technologies Inc, Counter Defendant Launch Pad Technologies Inc. (Gustitus, Sandra)
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, , CROSSCLAIM against defendant Deanna Moore by Deanna Moore.(Haddad, Joseph)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph J Haddad on behalf of Cross Defendant Deanna Moore. (Haddad, Joseph)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Launch Pad Technologies Inc (Chenoweth, Brian)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by Launch Pad Technologies Inc.(Chenoweth, Brian)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Deanna Moore on 5/27/2021, filed by Counter Claimant ADT LLC. (Morisset, Catharine)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent/Affiliate ADT Inc. and Apollo Global Management Inc for ADT LLC, ADT LLC, ADT LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ADT LLC (Morisset, Catharine) Modified on 6/4/2021 (SP)to add corporate parent/affiliate.
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Defendant ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Morisset, Catharine)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/9/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/16/2021, Joint Status Report due by 8/23/2021. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
May 24, 2021 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (SP)
May 24, 2021 JSR due 8/23/2021. (JL)
May 24, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) ADT LLC and Plaintiff(s) Launch Pad Technologies Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/1/2021. (SP)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand ., CROSSCLAIM against defendant Deanna Moore, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Launch Pad Technologies, Inc. dba Entrance Controls by ADT, LLC.(Morisset, Catharine)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Erik Isakson re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant ADT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Morisset, Catharine)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 21-2-00503-34; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7094159), filed by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit)(Morisset, Catharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Launch Pad Technologies Inc v. ADT LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Deanna Moore
Represented By: Joseph J Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, LLC
Represented By: Catharine M Morisset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Launch Pad Technologies, Inc. dba Entrance Controls
Represented By: Brian D. Chenoweth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Launch Pad Technologies Inc doing business as Entrance Controls
Represented By: Brian D. Chenoweth
Represented By: Sandra Gustitus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ADT LLC
Represented By: Catharine M Morisset
Represented By: Meghan Ashley-Renee McNabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?