Putzier et al v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Marvin D Putzier and Tamara A Putzier
Defendant: Wells Fargo NA and Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2021cv05434
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/7/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/13/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (KMC)
June 11, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KMC)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Marvin D Putzier, Tamara A Putzier (Schneider, Kenneth)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT To Quiet Title against defendant(s) Wells Fargo NA (Receipt # AWAWDC-7119357) Attorney Kenneth Joseph Schneider added to party Marvin D Putzier(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth Joseph Schneider added to party Tamara A Putzier(pty:pla), filed by Marvin D Putzier, Tamara A Putzier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schneider, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Putzier et al v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin D Putzier
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara A Putzier
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?