Nicholson v. BLEFA Kegs Inc et al
Plaintiff: David Nicholson
Defendant: BLEFA Kegs, Inc., Grinding and Polishing Machinery Corporation, BLEFA Kegs Inc and John Doe Manufacturer 1-5
Case Number: 3:2021cv05435
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Grinding and Polishing Machinery Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Van Ness, Ross)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/7/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/13/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Grinding and Polishing Machinery Corporation.(Van Ness, Ross)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ArtemisHolding Group for BLEFA Kegs Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BLEFA Kegs Inc (Norman, David)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant BLEFA Kegs Inc (Norman, David)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint; by BLEFA Kegs Inc.(Norman, David)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KMC)
June 11, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KMC)
June 11, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, BLEFA Kegs Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/18/2021. (KMC)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Grinding and Polishing Machinery Corporation (Van Ness, Ross)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 21-2-00589-06; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7119368), filed by Grinding and Polishing Machinery Corporation, BLEFA Kegs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Ness, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholson v. BLEFA Kegs Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLEFA Kegs, Inc.
Represented By: William James Leedom
Represented By: David M Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinding and Polishing Machinery Corporation
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Ross C Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLEFA Kegs Inc
Represented By: David M Norman
Represented By: William James Leedom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Manufacturer 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Nicholson
Represented By: Jason J Hoeft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?