Caudill v. Hoodsport Winery Inc
Plaintiff: Lois M Caudill and Lois Caudill
Defendant: Hoodsport Winery Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05445
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Hoodsport Winery Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissal) Noting Date 9/3/2021, (Rhodes, Gregory)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gregory M Rhodes on behalf of Defendant Hoodsport Winery Inc. (Rhodes, Gregory)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Hoodsport Winery Inc. (SP)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Lois Caudill (Rossback, Thomas)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 9/28/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/14/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Lois M Caudill. (Rossback, Thomas)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet Omitted. ***Action Required*** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KMC)
June 21, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KMC)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Hoodsport Winery Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7130286), filed by Lois M Caudill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rossback, Thomas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/17/2021 to correct document sizing issues only) (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caudill v. Hoodsport Winery Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoodsport Winery Inc
Represented By: Gregory M Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois M Caudill
Represented By: Thomas Rossback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Caudill
Represented By: Thomas Rossback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?