Kelley v. United States of America
Petitioner: Troy X. Kelley and Troy X Kelley
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv05476
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Answer Petitioner's 2255 Motion, filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/3/2021, (Friedman, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #15 MOTION. (Friedman, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #12 MOTION for Recusal. (Wilkinson, C)
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Immediate Relief After Government Failed to Meet Court Ordered Answer Date, filed by Petitioner Troy X Kelley. Noted by clerk for 9/3/2021. (SR)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY, filed by Petitioner Troy X Kelley, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief. (SR)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #11 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief. (Wilkinson, C)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Recuse Andrew Friedman and Prosecution Team, filed by Petitioner Troy X Kelley. Noted by Clerk for 8/27/2021. (PM)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Petitioner Troy X Kelley. Noted by Clerk for 8/20/2021, (Clerk's note: posted in 21-cv-5476-RSM per direction of chambers) (PM)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Modify Release Request, filed by Petitioner Troy X Kelley. Noted by Clerk for 8/20/2021. (Clerk's note: posted in 21-cv-5476-RSM per direction of chambers) (PM)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY, filed by Petitioner Troy X Kelley, TO RESPONSE to #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (AMD)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice Petitioner's #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Petitioner via USPS
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, #1 2255 MOTION. Electronic posting of this Order and Petitioner's 2255 Motion shall effect service upon the United States Attorney. Respondent's Answer due within 45 days after the filing of Petitioner's 2255 Motion. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Petitioner via USPS
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge Benjamin H. Settle is recused from this case and the case is reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT/Additional Facts in Support of #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Petitioner Troy X Kelley (signed by Diane Kelley). (AMD)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Friedman, Andrew)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER to Petitioner re case number and Judge assignment. (AMD - via USPS)
July 2, 2021 2255 Motion to Vacate filed 7/1/2021. (AMD)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Petitioner Troy X. Kelley. Noting Date 7/16/2021. (AMD)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255), filed by Troy X. Kelley. Related to criminal case: 3:15-cr-05198-BHS.(AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Andrew C Friedman
Represented By: C Seth Wilkinson
Represented By: Michelle Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy X. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy X Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?