Mansur Properties LLC v. First American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mansur Properties LLC
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv05491
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/12/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/18/2021, Joint Status Report due by 10/25/2021. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
July 26, 2021 JSR due 10/25/2021. (JL)
July 20, 2021 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Olson, Courtney)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Courtney J Olson on behalf of Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Olson, Courtney)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mansur Properties LLC (Conway, Jesse)
July 14, 2021 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. Judge J Richard Creatura no longer assigned to case. (SP)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses by First American Title Insurance Company.(Peterson, Thomas)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/20/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
July 12, 2021 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SP)
July 12, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Mansur Properties LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/19/2021. (SP)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent/Affiliates First American Financial Corporation, Blackrock Inc and The Vanguard Group for First American Title Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Peterson, Thomas) Modified on 7/12/2021 add additional affiliates (SP).
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Sakae Sakai ISO Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company (Peterson, Thomas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Peterson, Thomas)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 21-2-01069-06; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7157183) Attorney Thomas F. Peterson added to party First American Title Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint State Court Complaint)(Peterson, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mansur Properties LLC v. First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansur Properties LLC
Represented By: Jesse D Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas F. Peterson
Represented By: Courtney J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?