Holm v. Meyers et al
Plaintiff: Keith Howard Holm, Head Hunter and Keith H Holm
Defendant: Michael Meyers and M/Y Head Hunter
Case Number: 3:2021cv05501
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 4 days. Bench Trial is set for 9/12/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/14/2022, Discovery completed by 3/16/2022, Dispositive motions due by 4/15/2022, Motions in Limine due by 8/8/2022, Joint Pretrial Statement due by 8/15/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. (Waller, Thomas)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael Meyers.(Waller, Thomas)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/9/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/16/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Mark A. Krisher added for Michael Meyers; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas George Waller on behalf of Defendant Michael Meyers. (Waller, Thomas)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned due to initial case assignment error: Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GMR)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Michael Meyers. (SP)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Keith H Holm. (Gibbons, Steven)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (SP)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRAECIPE re #1 Complaint to hold process in abeyance against vessel by Plaintiff Keith Howard Holm (Gibbons, Steven)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Keith Howard Holm (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gibbons, Steven)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED against defendant(s) Michael Meyers Attorney Steven V Gibbons added to party Keith Howard Holm(pty:pla), filed by Keith Howard Holm.(Gibbons, Steven) (Waived) Fee Pending Modified on 7/20/2021 to reflect filing fee status (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holm v. Meyers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Howard Holm
Represented By: Steven V Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Head Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith H Holm
Represented By: Steven V Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Meyers
Represented By: Mark A. Krisher
Represented By: Thomas George Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y Head Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?