Revell v. VillagePlan Care Options LLC
Plaintiff: Valerie Revell
Defendant: VillagePlan Care Options LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv05548
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/30/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/14/2021, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
September 9, 2021 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 10/21/2021. (KEB)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant VillagePlan Care Options LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Minear, Jonathan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Valerie Revell (Emens, Rachel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Magistrate Judge David W. Christel for all further proceedings, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; And Affirmative Defenses by VillagePlan Care Options LLC.(O'Connor, Bryan) Modified on 8/5/2021 to include link to doc #1 Removal (AMD).
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 8/9/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
August 2, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 2:21-cv-01008 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Tacoma case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 3:21-cv-05548-DWC. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (RE)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Defendant's sole member is Aging of America Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Villageplan Care Options, LLC. (O'Connor, Bryan) Modified on 8/2/2021 to add corporate/affiliate info. (RE)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Jon Minear re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant VILLAGEPLAN CARE OPTIONS, LLC (O'Connor, Bryan)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant VILLAGEPLAN CARE OPTIONS, LLC. (O'Connor, Bryan) (Main Document 2 replaced for malformed PDF on 7/29/2021) (MET).
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 21-2-06541-6; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7185912) Attorney Bryan Patrick O'Connor added to party VILLAGEPLAN CARE OPTIONS, LLC(pty:dft), filed by VILLAGEPLAN CARE OPTIONS, LLC.(O'Connor, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2021: #1 Complaint) (RE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revell v. VillagePlan Care Options LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Revell
Represented By: Rachel M. Emens
Represented By: Henry Brudney
Represented By: Jason A Rittereiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VillagePlan Care Options LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Minear
Represented By: Bryan Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?