Armstead et al v. Washington State Department of Enterprise Services et al
Plaintiff: Wilford Armstead
Defendant: State Enterprise Services, Department of Corrections, Office of Risk Management, Bob Ferguson and Washington State Department of Enterprise Services
Case Number: 3:2021cv05557
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Judge J Richard Creatura added as referral judge and Judge James L. Robart to remain presiding judge.**0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944) (AMD)
August 23, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #1 Notice of Removal : Corrected the party names. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944) (AMD)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944) (AMD)
August 6, 2021 Judge James L. Robart added. **DO NOT PRINT**(Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944) (AMD)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Timothy J. Feulner in Support of Removal of Thurston County Superior Court Cause No. 21-2-01302-34 to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Bob Ferguson, Department of Corrections, Office of Risk Management, State Enterprise Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit pp. 4-72)(Feulner, Timothy) **72 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Bob Ferguson, Department of Corrections, Office of Risk Management, State Enterprise Services (Feulner, Timothy) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 21-2-01302-34; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7196174) Attorney Timothy J Feulner added to party Bob Ferguson(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Feulner added to party Department of Corrections(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Feulner added to party Office of Risk Management(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Feulner added to party Washington State Department of Enterprise Services State Enterprise Services(pty:dft), filed by Office of Risk Management, Department of Corrections, State Washington State Department of Enterprise Services, Bob Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feulner, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2021: #2 Thurston County Complaint) (AMD). Modified parties on 8/23/2021 (AMD). **20 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Wilford Armstead, Prisoner ID: 629944)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstead et al v. Washington State Department of Enterprise Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilford Armstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Enterprise Services
Represented By: Timothy J Feulner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Timothy J Feulner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Risk Management
Represented By: Timothy J Feulner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Ferguson
Represented By: Timothy J Feulner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Enterprise Services
Represented By: Timothy J Feulner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?