Hensley v. Pourhassan et al
Plaintiff: Billie Ray Hensley
Defendant: Nader Z. Pourhassan, Scott A. Kelly, Michael Mulholland, Alan P. Timmins, Samir R. Patel, Jordan G. Naydenov, Nader Z Pourhassan, Scott A Kelly, Alan P Timmins, Samir R Patel and Jordan G Naydenov
Nominal Defendant: CytoDyn, Inc. and CytoDyn Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05593
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS (with Lead Case C21-5422RJB). Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Bryan for all further proceedings. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to case. (KMP)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 Amended Stipulated MOTION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS, filed by Nominal Defendant CytoDyn Inc, Defendants Scott A Kelly, Michael Mulholland, Jordan G Naydenov, Samir R Patel, Nader Z Pourhassan, Alan P Timmins. Noting Date 9/7/2021, (Burnside, Fred)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS, filed by Nominal Defendant CytoDyn Inc, Defendants Scott A Kelly, Michael Mulholland, Jordan G Naydenov, Samir R Patel, Nader Z Pourhassan, Alan P Timmins. Noting Date 9/7/2021, (Burnside, Fred)
September 2, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Alan P Timmins mailed on 9/2/2021 (Turner, Duncan)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Nader Z Pourhassan mailed on 9/2/2021 (Turner, Duncan)
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Samir R Patel mailed on 9/2/2021 (Turner, Duncan)
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jordan G Naydenov mailed on 9/2/2021 (Turner, Duncan)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Michael Mulholland mailed on 9/2/2021 (Turner, Duncan)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Scott A Kelly mailed on 9/2/2021 (Turner, Duncan)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant CytoDyn Inc mailed on 9/2/2021 (Turner, Duncan)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/3/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Fred B Burnside on behalf of Nominal Defendant CytoDyn Inc, Defendants Scott A Kelly, Michael Mulholland, Jordan G Naydenov, Samir R Patel, Nader Z Pourhassan, Alan P Timmins. (Burnside, Fred)
August 27, 2021 Attorney Brendan Thomas Mangan added for Nominal Defendant CytoDyn Inc, Defendants Scott A Kelly, Michael Mulholland, Jordan G Naydenov, Samir R Patel, Nader Z Pourhassan, Alan P Timmins; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (KMP)
August 23, 2021 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (KMC)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 ERRATA re #1 Complaint Appendix to Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Billie Ray Hensley (Turner, Duncan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 21-cv-05190; 21-cv-05422, by Plaintiff Billie Ray Hensley. (Turner, Duncan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7214319), filed by Billie Ray Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Turner, Duncan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. Pourhassan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Ray Hensley
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nader Z. Pourhassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mulholland
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan P. Timmins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samir R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan G. Naydenov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nader Z Pourhassan
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A Kelly
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan P Timmins
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samir R Patel
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan G Naydenov
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: CytoDyn, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: CytoDyn Inc
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?