Twin Harbors Waterkeeper v. Local Manufacturing Inc
Plaintiff: Twin Harbors Waterkeeper
Defendant: Local Manufacturing, Inc. and Local Manufacturing Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05654
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the joint request of the parties and for good cause shown, the deadlines set per the Court Order at dkt #4 are continued as follows:FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/15/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/22/2021, Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2021. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/27/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/13/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/20/2021. (LC)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Twin Harbors Waterkeeper (Rose, Savannah)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Local Manufacturing Inc. (KMC)
September 9, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Twin Harbors Waterkeeper must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/16/2021. (KMC)
September 9, 2021 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (KMC)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Local Manufacturing, Inc. (Receipt # AWAWDC-7239822), filed by Twin Harbors Waterkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Rose, Savannah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twin Harbors Waterkeeper v. Local Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin Harbors Waterkeeper
Represented By: Meredith A Crafton
Represented By: Richard Adam Smith
Represented By: Savannah Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?