Souza v. Haynes et al
Plaintiff: Robert Souza
Defendant: Ronald Haynes, Sara Kariko, Ryan Herrington and Ron Attard
Case Number: 3:2021cv05659
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Referring Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S #7 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff, not later than November 15, 2021, shall either file an amended complaint consistent with the #6 Order or advise the Court that he does, in fact, wish to dismiss the action. If the Plaintiff fails to communicate his intention by the date set forth above, the Court will dismiss the action for failure to prosecute. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Souza, Prisoner ID: 389023)(ST)
October 25, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2021. **DO NOT PRINT**(Robert Souza, Prisoner ID: 389023)(ST)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Voluntarily Withdraw #5 1983 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Robert Souza. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Souza, Prisoner ID: 389023)(ST)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE #5 COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND, by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. Amended complaint due on or before November 4, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Amended 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)**18 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Souza, Prisoner ID: 389023)(ST)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Robert Souza against defendant(s) Ron Attard, Ronald Haynes, Ryan Herrington, Sara Kariko with JURY DEMAND **DO NOT PRINT**(Robert Souza, Prisoner ID: 389023)(ST)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Souza, Prisoner ID: 389023)(ST)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Vaughan, filed by Robert Souza. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)**11 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Souza, Prisoner ID: 389023)(ST)
September 22, 2021 IFP deficiency corrected **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Souza, Prisoner ID: 389023)(ST)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 10/12/2021 to correct IFP application **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Souza, Prisoner ID: 389023)(ST) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2021: #1 IFP form. Documents regenerated. Facility notified.) (ST)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Souza. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)**10 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Souza, Prisoner ID: 389023)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souza v. Haynes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Kariko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Attard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?