Gardner v. Boirum
Plaintiff: Michael Patrick Gardner and Patrick Michael Griffith
Defendant: Dillon Boirum
Case Number: 3:2021cv05671
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Dillon Boirum on 11/2/2021, filed by Plaintiff Michael Patrick Gardner. (Barrera, Paul)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Clare Elizabeth Bogdanowicz on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Patrick Gardner. (Bogdanowicz, Clare)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Dillon Boirum. (SP)
September 15, 2021 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SP)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Dillon Boirum with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7248331) Attorney Paul Andre Barrera added to party Michael Patrick Gardner(pty:pla), filed by Michael Patrick Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Barrera, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. Boirum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Patrick Gardner
Represented By: Paul Andre Barrera
Represented By: Clare Elizabeth Bogdanowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Michael Griffith
Represented By: Paul Andre Barrera
Represented By: Clare Elizabeth Bogdanowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Boirum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?