Jones v. Beese et al
Plaintiff: Victor Jones
Defendant: Paul Beese, Southeast Salmon, Inc. and Southeast Salmon Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05688
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Paul Beese, Southeast Salmon Inc (Reno, Vi)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Marker E Lovell, Jr for Defendants Paul Beese and Southeast Salmon Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Chih Yu (Joseph) Ou for Defendants Paul Beese and Southeast Salmon Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Marker E. Lovell, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Paul Beese, Southeast Salmon Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7288273 (Reno, Vi)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Chih Yu (Joseph) Ou FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Paul Beese, Southeast Salmon Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7288236 (Reno, Vi)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Seaman for Personal Injuries Attorney Vi Jean Reno added to party Paul Beese(pty:dft), Attorney Vi Jean Reno added to party Southeast Salmon Inc(pty:dft) by Paul Beese, Southeast Salmon Inc.(Reno, Vi)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Southeast Salmon, Inc. on 9/23/2021, filed by Plaintiff Victor Jones. (Deitz, Adam)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Paul Beese on 9/23/2021, filed by Plaintiff Victor Jones. (Deitz, Adam)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/6/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/13/2021, Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2021. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Paul Beese, Southeast Salmon Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(AMD)
September 20, 2021 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (AMD)
September 20, 2021 JSR due 12/20/2021. (JL)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Victor Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Deitz, Adam) (Prepayment Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Beese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Jones
Represented By: Adam Deitz
Represented By: Douglas Ralph Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Beese
Represented By: Chih Yu (Joseph) Ou
Represented By: Marker E Lovell, Jr
Represented By: Vi Jean Reno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Salmon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Salmon Inc
Represented By: Chih Yu (Joseph) Ou
Represented By: Marker E Lovell, Jr
Represented By: Vi Jean Reno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?