Carter-Mixon et al v. City of Tacoma et al
Plaintiff: Monet Carter-Mixon, Estate of Manuel Ellis and marcia Carter
Defendant: City of Tacoma, Christopher burbank, Mathew collins, masyih ford, Timothy rankine, Armando Farinas, ron komarovsky, Pierce County, Gary Sanders, Anthony Messineo and Matthew Collins
Case Number: 3:2021cv05692
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Anthony Messineo, Pierce County, Gary Sanders.(Helmberger, Peter)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Monet Carter-Mixon.(Bible, James)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT/ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Robert L. Christie, on behalf of Defendant City of Tacoma, on 10/18/2021. (Christie, Robert)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen Dermer for Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew A Ericksen, Sr for Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen Dermer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7292978 (Bible, James)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mathew Ericksen Sr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7292977 (Bible, James)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Christopher Burbank, City of Tacoma, Matthew Collins, Armando Farinas, Masyih Ford, Ron Komarovsky, Anthony Messineo, Pierce County, Timothy Rankine and Gary Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(SP)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Peter J Helmberger on behalf of Defendants Anthony Messineo, Pierce County, Gary Sanders. (Helmberger, Peter)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/14/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/21/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Gary Sanders by Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bible, James)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Timothy Rankine by Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bible, James)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Anthony Messineo by Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bible, James)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Ron Komarovsky by Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bible, James)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Masyih Ford by Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bible, James)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Armando Farinas by Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bible, James)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Mathew Collins by Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bible, James)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Christopher Burbank by Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bible, James)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Pierce County by Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bible, James)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to City of Tacoma by Plaintiff Monet Carter-Mixon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bible, James)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Barry on behalf of Defendant City of Tacoma. (Barry, John)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Leslie Christie on behalf of Defendant City of Tacoma. (Christie, Robert)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT of all plaintiffs against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7255511) Attorney James Bible added to party Monet Carter-Mixon(pty:pla), filed by Monet Carter-Mixon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bible, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter-Mixon et al v. City of Tacoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monet Carter-Mixon
Represented By: James Bible
Represented By: Matthew A Ericksen, Sr
Represented By: Stephen Dermer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Manuel Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: marcia Carter
Represented By: James Bible
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tacoma
Represented By: John Barry
Represented By: Robert Leslie Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher burbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: masyih ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy rankine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Farinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ron komarovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County
Represented By: Peter J Helmberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Sanders
Represented By: Peter J Helmberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Messineo
Represented By: Peter J Helmberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?