Silva v. Strange
Plaintiff: Ramon Saul Silva, Jr
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Case Number: 3:2021cv05719
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge J Richard Creatura, re #1 Proposed Document(s), filed by Ramon Saul Silva, Jr. The Court orders plaintiff to either pay the $402 filing fee for this matter or move to proceed in forma pauperis on or before 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(AMD)
November 5, 2021 Filing Fee paid or IFP filed on or before 12/6/2021, re #4 Order to Show Cause. **DO NOT PRINT**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(AMD)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** 1983 Filing Fee Not Paid.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 10/29/2021 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(AMD)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ramon Saul Silva, Jr. (NO FILING FEE/NO IFP APPLICATION RECEIVED) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)**90 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609) (AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Saul Silva, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?