MG Premium Ltd v. Does 1-20
Plaintiff: MG Premium Ltd
Defendant: Does 1-20 and Does 1-20 doing business as Daftsex.com doing business as Artsporn.com
Case Number: 3:2021cv05733
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/12/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/29/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/5/2022. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Mind Geek S.a.r.l. as Corporate Parent and/or Affiliate. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by MG Premium Ltd (Freeman, Spencer) Modified on 10/18/2021 (ZMG).
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (SP)
October 7, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) MG Premium Ltd must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/14/2021. (SP)
October 7, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Does 1-20 with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7276412) Attorney Spencer D Freeman added to party MG Premium Ltd(pty:pla), filed by MG Premium Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freeman, Spencer) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/4/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MG Premium Ltd v. Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MG Premium Ltd
Represented By: Spencer D Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20 doing business as Daftsex.com doing business as Artsporn.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?