Washington Election Integrity Coalition United et al v. Kimsey et al
Plaintiff: Washington Election Integrity Coalition United, Brett Simpson, Bonnie Grieco, Jonette Molyneux, Ross Merritt, Tamara Shaw, Harlyn Thompson, Kimberlee Elbon, Robert Ward, Constance Cooke, Doreen Rose, Shirley Mozena, James Mozena, Michelle Dawson, Lindsey Nichols, Joseph Kent, Roxanne Pearce, David Machado, Joshua Bradley, Bennett Esrael, Jake Parmer, Rich Audette, Maria Bruemmer, Joseph Gibson, Eric Hargrave, Wendy Keeline, Phillip Hogan, Marili Haas, Ike Haas, Frank Gmelin, Tricia Shoup, Jen Holbrook, Stephen Clements, Kimberly Anderson and Susan Audette
Defendant: Greg Kimsey, Clark County and Does 1-30
Intervenor: Washington State Democratic Central Committee and Washington State Democratic Party
Case Number: 3:2021cv05746
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Defendant Clark County, to #17 MOTION to Dismiss . (Burns, Curtis)
November 22, 2021 Filing 31 Notice MOTION for Joinder , filed by Plaintiff Brett Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service filed w/ Superior Court)(Simpson, Brett) Modified on 11/29/2021 to terminate motion and correct document title (SR).
November 22, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE: Plaintiff Brett Simpson has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
November 20, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition United, to #17 MOTION to Dismiss . (Shogren, Virginia)
November 19, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition United, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Remand (Shogren, Virginia)
November 12, 2021 Filing 27 Mail addressed to Lindsey Nichols returned as Undeliverable re Case Assigned/Reassigned, Notice-Other, #14 Minute Order. (SR) Modified on 11/15/2021: Plaintiff Nichols called and corrected discrepancy between Notice of Removal and State Court Complaint. Address updated, dkt #14 re-mailed. (MW).
November 9, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Washington State Democratic Central Committee, TO RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Intervene (Hamilton, Kevin)
November 8, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE, by Defendants Clark County, Greg Kimsey, to #16 MOTION to Remand , #12 MOTION to Sever. (Migchelbrink, Amanda)
November 5, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition United, to #22 MOTION to Intervene . (Shogren, Virginia)
October 27, 2021 Filing 23 Mail addressed to Lindsey Nichols returned as Undeliverable re #10 Minute Order and #9 Standing Order. (SR)
October 27, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Intervene , filed by Intervenor Washington State Democratic Central Committee. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/12/2021, (Hamilton, Kevin)
October 27, 2021 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to defer entry of an initial case scheduling order pending its ruling on #16 MOTION to Remand, filed by Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition United and #17 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Clark County, Greg Kimsey. (cc: Pro Se Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE)
October 26, 2021 Attorney Amanda J Beane, Reina A Almon-Griffin, Nitika Arora added for Washington State Democratic Party; per #21 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
October 25, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin J Hamilton on behalf of Intervenor Washington State Democratic Party. (Hamilton, Kevin)
October 25, 2021 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Amanda Migchelbrink filed by Defendants Clark County, Greg Kimsey re #17 MOTION to Dismiss (Migchelbrink, Amanda)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Greg Kimsey filed by Defendants Clark County, Greg Kimsey re #17 MOTION to Dismiss (Migchelbrink, Amanda)
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Clark County, Greg Kimsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/26/2021, (Migchelbrink, Amanda)
October 22, 2021 Filing 20 Mail addressed to Lindsey Nichols returned as "Return to Sender/No Such Number/Unable to Forward" re Corporate Disclosure Statement Deficiency, #5 Judge Assignment Letter, #6 Notice of Filing Deficiency - Jury Demand, and case docket sheet. (SP)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition United. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/19/2021, (Shogren, Virginia)
October 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Virginia Pearson Shogren on behalf of Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition United. (Shogren, Virginia)
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. The local rules require that business entities other than sole proprietorships be represented by counsel. Accordingly, Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition United's pro se #12 MOTION to Strike Notice of Removal, or Alternatively, Sever Claims Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(c)(2) is STRICKEN. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE)
October 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #12 MOTION to Strike Notice of Removal, or Alternatively, to Sever Claims, by Plaintiffs Kimberly Anderson, Rich Audette, Susan Audette, Joshua Bradley, Maria Bruemmer, Stephen Clements, Constance Cooke, Bennett Esrael, Joseph Gibson, Frank Gmelin, Bonnie Grieco, Ike Haas, Marili Haas, Eric Hargrave, Phillip Hogan, Jen Holbrook, Wendy Keeline, Joseph Kent, Ross Merritt, Jonette Molyneux, James Mozena, Shirley Mozena, Lindsey Nichols, Jake Parmer, Doreen Rose, Tamara Shaw, Tricia Shoup, Brett Simpson, Harlyn Thompson, Robert Ward. (MW)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Notice of Removal, or Alternatively, Sever Claims, filed by Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition United (submitted pro se). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MW)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Washington State Democratic Central Committee (Almon-Griffin, Reina)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition United appears pro se in this matter. Local Rule 83.2(b)(4) requires that business entities other than sole proprietorships be represented by counsel. The Court directs Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition United to obtain counsel and that counsel shall make an appearance no later than 11/10/2021. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) (VE)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Whatcom, Thurston, Franklin, King, and Lincoln County Superior Courts, case number(s) in other court 21-2-00949-37, 21-2-01641-34, 21-2-50572-11, 21-2-12603-7-KNT, 21-2-00042-22 ; filed by Defendants Clark County, Greg Kimsey. (Migchelbrink, Amanda)
October 12, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones as related to Case No. 3:21-cv-5726-RAJ. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. All future pleadings shall bear Case No. 3:21-cv-5746-RAJ. (cc: Plaintiffs via U.S. Mail) (KERR) Modified on 10/12/2021 (KERR).
October 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case Pendency of Other Action in United States District Court Western District of Washington at Seattle, United States District Court Western District of Washington at Seattle, case number(s) in other court 2:21-cv-01354-DWC, 3:21-cv-05726-RAJ ; filed by Defendants Clark County, Greg Kimsey. (Migchelbrink, Amanda) Modified on 10/14/2021 to update event name (KB).
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Notice of Removal - Jury Demand Improperly Submitted, Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 10/13/2021. (AMD - cc: pltfs)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AMD - cc: pltfs)
October 8, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Washington Election Integrity Coalition and Defendant Washington State Democratic Central Committee must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/15/2021. (AMD - cc: pltf)
October 8, 2021 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (AMD)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendants Clark County, Greg Kimsey. (Migchelbrink, Amanda)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiffs of Notice of Removal re #2 Verification of State Court Records, #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendants Clark County, Greg Kimsey. (Migchelbrink, Amanda)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS via Declaration of Amanda M. Migchelbrink with Exhibits 1-8 by Defendants Clark County, Greg Kimsey (Migchelbrink, Amanda)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 21-2-01775-06; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7282396), filed by Clark County, Greg Kimsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Migchelbrink, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington Election Integrity Coalition United et al v. Kimsey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Election Integrity Coalition United
Represented By: Virginia Pearson Shogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Simpson
Represented By: Brett Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonette Molyneux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlyn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberlee Elbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Mozena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mozena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett Esrael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Parmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Audette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Bruemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hargrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Keeline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marili Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ike Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Gmelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia Shoup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jen Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Audette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kimsey
Represented By: Amanda Marie Migchelbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Represented By: Amanda Marie Migchelbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Washington State Democratic Central Committee
Represented By: Amanda J Beane
Represented By: Kevin J Hamilton
Represented By: Nitika Arora
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Washington State Democratic Party
Represented By: Amanda J Beane
Represented By: Kevin J Hamilton
Represented By: Nitika Arora
Represented By: Reina A Almon-Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?