Gordon v. Inslee et al
Plaintiff: Ricky D Gordon and Deanna Lynn Gordon
Defendant: Jay Inslee, Cheryl Strange, Julie Martin, Ronald E Haynes, Erik Jackson, Jeneva Cotton, Bruce Gage, Karrie Rainer, Gabrielle Gaspar, Areig Awad and Gabreielle Gaspar
Case Number: 3:2021cv05802
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. To consent to a US Magistrate Judge, return the executed form by 1/19/2022. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ricky Gordon, Prisoner ID: 346853)(SP)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by E-Mail to the named defendants (10); signed by Judge David W. Christel. ( #5 Complaint, this Order, notice of lawsuit and waiver of service, and notice of option of consent emailed on 12/20/2021) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ricky Gordon, Prisoner ID: 346853)(SP)
December 20, 2021 Check status of service waivers per #7 Order Directing Service, due by 1/26/2022. **DO NOT PRINT**(Ricky Gordon, Prisoner ID: 346853)(SP)
December 15, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER from Ricky D Gordon re Payment of Filing Fee, filed by Ricky D Gordon. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ricky Gordon, Prisoner ID: 346853)(SP)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Areig Awad, Jeneva Cotton, Bruce Gage, Gabreielle Gaspar, Ronald E Haynes, Jay Inslee, Erik Jackson, Julie Martin, Karrie Rainer, and Cheryl Strange, filed by Ricky D Gordon. (Receipt # SEA106083) **21 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ricky Gordon, Prisoner ID: 346853)(SP)
December 15, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $402.00 - Receipt Number SEA106083. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ricky Gordon, Prisoner ID: 346853)(SP)
November 24, 2021 NOTICE TO FILER RE NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE re #4 Letter. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Monroe Correctional Complex. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. ***As of 11/24/2021, the Court has not received the filing fee through the USPS mail system. Please check with MCC as to whether payment was mailed to the Court on 10/26/2021. Thank you.*** **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ricky Gordon, Prisoner ID: 346853)(SP)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Ricky D Gordon re #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint and pending receipt of filing fee through the USPS mail system, filed by Ricky D Gordon. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ricky Gordon, Prisoner ID: 346853)(SP)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** 1983 Filing Fee Not Paid.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 11/29/2021 to correct IFP application. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form (blank)) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ricky Gordon, Prisoner ID: 346853)(SP)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Ricky D Gordon. (NO FILING FEE/NO IFP APPLICATION RECEIVED - Per plaintiff's transmittal letter the filing fee is being sent through the USPS mail system from the institution) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)**22 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ricky Gordon, Prisoner ID: 346853)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Inslee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky D Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Lynn Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Inslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeneva Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karrie Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabrielle Gaspar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Areig Awad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabreielle Gaspar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?