Stanley v. Mason County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Sloan Patrick Stanley
Defendant: Mason County Jail and Kevin Hanson
Case Number: 3:2021cv05860
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Marsha J Pechman
2 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION Requesting Judge Pechman to Review #6 MOTION to Accept Financial Statement re #4 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter, #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Sloan Patrick Stanley. Noted by clerk for: 2/4/2022. (SP)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #5 MOTION TO CHANGE MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND EXPEDITE ALL MATTERS, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT: Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action as to Kevin Hanson - Mason County Jail Chief, filed by Plaintiff Sloan Patrick Stanley. (SP)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DECLINING TO RECUSE; signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. The undersigned declines to recuse himself from the matter. The Court does not rule on the request to expedite matters, at present. Plaintiff's #5 motion shall be referred to Chief Judge Ricardo Martinez for a determination of its merits. (SP- plaintiff)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Accept Financial Statement re #4 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter, #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Sloan Patrick Stanley. Noting Date 12/31/2021. (AMD)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Magistrate Judge and to Expedite Matters, filed by Plaintiff Sloan Patrick Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) Noted by clerk for: 12/8/2021. (SP)
December 6, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Judge Benjamin H. Settle no longer assigned to the case. (AMD - cc: pltf)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ***Action Required*** Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 1/3/2022 to correct IFP application (ZMG)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (ZMG)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Sloan Patrick Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter re Complaint and IFP, #2 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)(ZMG) Modified on 12/1/2021 (ZMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Mason County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sloan Patrick Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?