Creekview IP LLC v. Logitech Inc
Plaintiff: Creekview IP LLC
Defendant: Logitech, Inc. and Logitech Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05866
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Plaintiff Creekview IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/26/2022, (Mann, Philip)
January 8, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Logitech Inc., C/O: CT Corporation System 711 Capitol Way South, Suite 204 Olympia, WA 98501 on 12/8/2021, filed by Plaintiff Creekview IP LLC. (Mann, Philip)
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan, United States Magistrate Judge; The Court DENIES #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (TF)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Plaintiff Creekview IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/27/2021, (Mann, Philip)
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Creekview IP LLC (Mann, Philip)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 Initial REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (AMD)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Logitech Inc. (AMD)
December 1, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/8/2021. (AMD)
December 1, 2021 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (AMD)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Logitech, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7350904) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Creekview IP LLC(pty:pla), filed by Creekview IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #5 Summons)(Mann, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creekview IP LLC v. Logitech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creekview IP LLC
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logitech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?